Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2908 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Paxton (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 2908
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 12, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 22, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2908 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of property tax lenders and the
 confidentiality of certain information obtained or compiled by the
 consumer credit commissioner on examination of property tax lenders
 and certain other license holders or registrants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 14, Finance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 14.2015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 14.2015.  CONFIDENTIALITY OF CERTAIN INFORMATION. (a)
 Except as provided by Subsection (b), information or material
 obtained or compiled by the commissioner in relation to an
 examination by the commissioner or the commissioner's
 representative of a license holder or registrant under Subtitle B
 or C, Title 4, or Chapter 394 is confidential and may not be
 disclosed by the commissioner or an officer or employee of the
 Office of Consumer Credit Commissioner, including:
 (1)  information obtained from a license holder or
 registrant under Subtitle B or C, Title 4, or Chapter 394;
 (2)  work performed by the commissioner or the
 commissioner's representative on information obtained from a
 license holder or registrant for the purposes of an examination
 conducted under Subtitle B or C, Title 4, or Chapter 394;
 (3)  a report on an examination of a license holder or
 registrant conducted under Subtitle B or C, Title 4, or Chapter 394;
 and
 (4)  any written communications between the license
 holder or registrant, as applicable, and the commissioner or the
 commissioner's representative relating to or referencing an
 examination conducted under Subtitle B or C, Title 4, or Chapter
 394.
 (b)  The commissioner or the commissioner's representative
 may disclose the confidential information or material described by
 Subsection (a):
 (1)  to a department, agency, or instrumentality of
 this state or the United States if the commissioner considers
 disclosure to be necessary or proper to the enforcement of the laws
 of this state or the United States and in the best interest of the
 public;
 (2)  if the license holder or registrant consents to
 the release of the information or has published the information
 contained in the release; or
 (3)  if the commissioner determines that release of the
 information is required for an administrative hearing.
 SECTION 2. Section 351.004, Finance Code, as added by
 Chapter 1220 (H.B. 2138), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2007, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.004. AFFILIATED BUSINESS ARRANGEMENTS. A property
 tax lender may conduct business under this chapter in an office,
 office suite, room, or place of business in which any other business
 is conducted or in combination with any other business unless the
 commissioner:
 (1)  determines after a hearing that the conduct of the
 other business in that office, office suite, room, or place of
 business has concealed an evasion of this chapter; and
 (2)  orders the lender in writing to desist from the
 conduct of the other business in that office, office suite, room, or
 place of business. [This chapter may not be construed to prevent
 affiliated or controlled business arrangements or loan origination
 services by or between a property tax lender and other
 professionals.]
 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 351, Finance Code, as
 added by Chapter 1220 (H.B. 2138), Acts of the 80th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2007, is amended by adding Sections 351.008
 through 351.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.008.  EXAMINATION OF LENDERS; ACCESS TO RECORDS.
 (a) The commissioner or the commissioner's representative shall,
 at the times the commissioner or the representative considers
 necessary:
 (1)  examine each place of business of each property
 tax lender; and
 (2)  investigate the lender's transactions, including
 loans, and records, including books, accounts, papers, and
 correspondence, to the extent the transactions and records pertain
 to the business regulated under this chapter and Sections 32.06 and
 32.065, Tax Code.
 (b) The property tax lender shall:
 (1)  give the commissioner or the commissioner's
 representative free access to the lender's office, place of
 business, files, safes, and vaults; and
 (2)  allow the commissioner or the representative to
 make a copy of an item that may be investigated under Subsection
 (a)(2).
 (c)  During an examination, the commissioner or the
 commissioner's representative may administer oaths and examine any
 person under oath on any subject pertinent to a matter that the
 commissioner or the representative is authorized or required to
 consider, investigate, or secure information about under this
 chapter or Section 32.06 or 32.065, Tax Code.
 (d)  Information obtained under this section is
 confidential.
 (e)  A property tax lender's violation of Subsection (b) is a
 ground for the suspension or revocation of the lender's license.
 Sec. 351.009.  GENERAL INVESTIGATION. (a) To discover a
 violation of this chapter or Section 32.06 or 32.065, Tax Code, or
 to obtain information required under this chapter or Section 32.06
 or 32.065, Tax Code, the commissioner or the commissioner's
 representative may investigate the records, including books,
 accounts, papers, and correspondence, of a person, including a
 property tax lender, who the commissioner or the representative has
 reasonable cause to believe is violating this chapter or Section
 32.06 or 32.065, Tax Code, regardless of whether the person claims
 to not be subject to this chapter or Section 32.06 or 32.065, Tax
 Code.
 (b)  For the purposes of this section, a person who
 advertises, solicits, or otherwise represents that the person is
 willing to make a property tax loan is presumed to be engaged in the
 business described by Section 351.051.
 Sec. 351.010.  REFUSAL TO ALLOW EXAMINATION OR INSPECTION.
 A property tax lender who fails or refuses to permit an examination
 or investigation authorized by this subchapter violates this
 chapter. The failure or refusal is grounds for the suspension or
 revocation of the lender's license.
 Sec. 351.011.  VERIFICATION OF NET ASSETS. If the
 commissioner questions the amount of a property tax lender's net
 assets, the commissioner may require certification by an
 independent certified public accountant that:
 (1)  the accountant has reviewed the property tax
 lender's books, other records, and transactions during the
 reporting year;
 (2)  the books and other records are maintained using
 generally accepted accounting principles; and
 (3)  the property tax lender meets the net assets
 requirement of Section 351.153.
 SECTION 4. Section 32.06(a-4), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a-4) The Finance Commission of Texas shall:
 (1) prescribe the form and content of an appropriate
 disclosure statement to be provided to a property owner before the
 execution of a tax lien transfer; [and]
 (2) adopt rules relating to the reasonableness of
 closing costs, fees, and other charges permitted under this
 section; and
 (3)  by rule prescribe the form and content of the sworn
 document under Subsection (a-1) and the certified statement under
 Subsection (b).
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *