Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2916 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: McReynolds (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2916
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to allowing certain claimants to file an application under
 the Crime Victims' Compensation Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 56.37, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  For a claim that is based on criminally injurious
 conduct in violation of Chapter 19, Penal Code, the claimant must
 file an application not later than three years after the date the
 identity of the victim is established by a law enforcement agency.
 SECTION 2. Article 56.61, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 56.61. COMPENSATION FOR CERTAIN CRIMINALLY INJURIOUS
 CONDUCT PROHIBITED; EXCEPTION. (a)  Except as provided by
 Subsection (b), the [The] attorney general may not award
 compensation for pecuniary [economic] loss arising from criminally
 injurious conduct that occurred before January 1, 1980.
 (b)  The attorney general may award compensation for
 pecuniary loss arising from criminally injurious conduct that
 occurred before January 1, 1980, if:
 (1)  the conduct was in violation of Chapter 19, Penal
 Code;
 (2)  the identity of the victim is established by a law
 enforcement agency on or after January 1, 2009, and the pecuniary
 loss was incurred with respect to the victim's funeral or burial on
 or after that date; and
 (3)  the claimant files the application for
 compensation within the limitations period provided by Article
 56.37(e).
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to criminally injurious conduct committed against a victim whose
 identity is established by a law enforcement agency on or after
 January 1, 2009. Criminally injurious conduct committed against a
 victim whose identity is established by a law enforcement agency
 before January 1, 2009, is covered by the law in effect on the date
 the victim's identity was established, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *