Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2918 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: McReynolds (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 2918
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 11, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2009,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a motor vehicle dealer's duty to notify buyers of
 compulsory inspection requirements for certain motor vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 2301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2301.363 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2301.363.  REQUIRED NOTICE. A dealer that sells or
 exchanges a motor home or a towable recreational vehicle subject to
 inspection under Chapter 548, Transportation Code, shall notify the
 buyer in writing at the time of the sale or exchange that the motor
 vehicle is subject to inspection requirements.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *