Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2963 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 2963
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the liability of a county, hospital district, or public
 hospital for the costs of health care services provided to an
 indigent patient.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 61.0045(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) A county, hospital district, or public hospital that
 receives information obtained under Subsection (a) shall use the
 information to determine whether the patient to whom services were
 provided is an eligible resident of the service area of the county,
 hospital district, or public hospital and, if so, shall pay the
 claim made by the provider to the extent that the county, hospital
 district, or public hospital is liable under Section 61.033 or
 61.060 [in accordance with this chapter].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *