Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3002 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Homer (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 3002
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 25, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 25, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain duties, functions, and procedures of county
 clerks, district clerks, and local registrars.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 64.091(d), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d) In an action under Subsection (b)(1):
 (1) the plaintiff, in the verified petition, must name
 the last known owner or the last record owner of the interest as
 defendant;
 (2) the plaintiff must serve notice on the defendant
 by publication as provided by the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure;
 (3) the court may appoint as receiver the county judge
 and his successors[, the county clerk and his successors,] or any
 other resident of the county in which the land is located;
 (4) notwithstanding the Texas Rules of Civil
 Procedure, the applicant is not required to post bond; and
 (5) the receiver is not required to post bond.
 SECTION 2. Section 64.093(d), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d) In an action under Subsection (a):
 (1) the plaintiff, in the petition, must name the last
 known owner or the last record owner of the interest as defendant;
 (2) the plaintiff must serve notice on the defendant
 by publication as provided by the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure;
 (3) the court may appoint as receiver the county
 judge[, the county clerk,] or any other resident of the county in
 which the land is located;
 (4) notwithstanding the Texas Rules of Civil
 Procedure, the applicant is not required to post bond; and
 (5) the receiver is not required to post bond.
 SECTION 3. Chapter 136, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 is amended by adding Section 136.002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 136.002.  ELECTRONIC CONFIRMATION OF DELIVERY OF
 CERTIFIED MAIL. (a) A district or county clerk who has implemented
 a system for the electronic filing of documents may provide for the
 electronic filing of confirmation of receipt of any document
 otherwise required by statute or rule to be sent by certified mail,
 return receipt requested.
 (b)  A clerk shall obtain services for the electronic filing
 of confirmation of receipt of a document from a provider the clerk
 determines is reliable and capable of providing the services. A
 confirmation filed under authority of this section is not subject
 to acknowledgment by the receiving station.
 (c)  A confirmation filed electronically in accordance with
 this section is an original record for filing and evidentiary
 purposes.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter I, Chapter 51, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.808 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.808.  ELECTRONIC CONFIRMATION OF DELIVERY OF
 CERTIFIED MAIL. (a) A district or county clerk who has implemented
 a system for the electronic filing of documents after approval by
 the supreme court under Section 51.803 may, without further
 approval but subject to the supreme court's authority to withdraw
 approval of the system, provide for the electronic filing of
 confirmation of receipt of any document otherwise required by
 statute or rule to be sent by certified mail, return receipt
 requested.
 (b)  A clerk shall obtain services for the electronic filing
 of confirmation of receipt of a document from a provider the clerk
 determines is reliable and capable of providing the services. A
 confirmation filed under authority of this section is not subject
 to acknowledgment by the receiving station under Section 51.804.
 (c)  A confirmation filed electronically in accordance with
 this section is an original record for filing and evidentiary
 purposes.
 SECTION 5. Section 102.010(c), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c) Citation by publication shall be sufficient if given in
 substantially the following form:
 To (names of persons to be served with citation) and to all whom it
 may concern (if the name of any person to be served with citation is
 unknown), Respondent(s),
 "STATE OF TEXAS
 "You have been sued. You may employ an attorney. If you or
 your attorney do (does) not file a written answer with the clerk who
 issued this citation by 10 a.m. on the Monday next following the
 expiration of 42 [20] days after you were served this citation and
 petition, a default judgment may be taken against you. The petition
 of ______________, Petitioner, was filed in the Court of
 _______________ County, Texas, on the ___ day of _________, _____,
 against __________, Respondent(s), numbered _____, and entitled '
 In the interest of __________, a child (or children).' The suit
 requests (statement of relief requested, e.g., 'terminate the
 parent-child relationship'). The date and place of birth of the
 child (children) who is (are) the subject of the suit:
 _____________.
 "The court has authority in this suit to render an order in
 the child's (children's) interest that will be binding on you,
 including the termination of the parent-child relationship, the
 determination of paternity, and the appointment of a conservator
 with authority to consent to the child's (children's) adoption.
 "Issued and given under my hand and seal of the Court at
 _________, Texas, this the ___ day of _______, ____.
 ". . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
 Clerk of the District Court of
 ______________ County, Texas.
 By _____________, Deputy."
 SECTION 6. Section 159.005(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) The county clerk shall make [mail two] copies of the
 form available to each person required to file under this
 subchapter within the time prescribed by Section 572.030(c),
 Government Code.
 SECTION 7. Section 191.030, Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 8. As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the applicable court shall appoint a replacement
 receiver for each county clerk serving on the effective date of this
 Act as a receiver under Section 64.091 or 64.093, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, as those sections existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act. The court shall provide for the
 transfer of all records, documents, and materials pertaining to the
 receivership from the county clerk to the replacement receiver
 appointed by the court.
 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *