Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3062 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3062
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the notice of an election provided to a voter registrar.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 4.008, Election Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 4.008. NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK. The governing body of a
 political subdivision, other than a county, that orders an election
 shall deliver notice of the election to the county clerk and voter
 registrar of each county in which the political subdivision is
 located not later than the 60th day before election day.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *