Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3082 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thibaut H.B. No. 3082
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3082By: Nichols By: Nichols
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 19, 2009, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the obstruction of streets by certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 311.001, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a) or (b) or Section
 311.007, before a municipality with a population of 1.9 million or
 more may install traffic calming measures within the municipality,
 the governing body of the municipality must:
 (1)  publish standards and criteria, which must include
 sufficient notice to allow the governing body to receive and
 consider public comments from residents within one-half mile of the
 proposed traffic calming measure;
 (2)  on request of affected residents, schedule and
 hold a public meeting before implementation of the measure; and
 (3)  if the measure involves the closure of a street to
 motor vehicular traffic, before the closure:
 (A)  hold a public hearing on the issue of the
 closure; and
 (B) approve the closure by a majority vote.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *