Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3094 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harless, Riddle, Alvarado H.B. No. 3094
 (Senate Sponsor - Patrick)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 April 24, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3094 By: Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of massage parlors by counties;
 providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 234, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. MASSAGE PARLORS
 Sec. 234.101. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Massage parlor" means a business establishment
 that purports to provide massage services and that allows:
 (A)  a nude person to provide massage services to
 a customer;
 (B)  a person to engage in sexual contact for
 compensation; or
 (C)  a person to provide massage services in
 clothing intended to arouse or gratify the sexual desire of any
 person.
 (2)  "Nude" and "sexual contact" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 455.202, Occupations Code.
 Sec. 234.102.  AUTHORITY TO REGULATE. To promote public
 health, safety, and welfare, the commissioners court of a county by
 order may prohibit or otherwise regulate massage parlors located in
 the unincorporated area of the county.
 Sec. 234.103.  INJUNCTION. If a massage parlor has
 previously violated a prohibition or other regulation adopted under
 this subchapter, a district or county attorney may bring suit to
 enjoin the operation of a massage parlor in violation or threatened
 violation of a prohibition or other regulation adopted under this
 subchapter.
 Sec. 234.104.  CIVIL PENALTY. (a)  A person who violates a
 prohibition or regulation adopted by the county under this
 subchapter is liable to the county for a civil penalty of not more
 than $1,000 for each violation. Each day a violation continues is
 considered a separate violation for purposes of assessing the civil
 penalty.
 (b)  A county may bring suit in a district court to recover a
 civil penalty authorized by Subsection (a).
 Sec. 234.105.  CRIMINAL PENALTY. (a)  A person commits an
 offense if the person intentionally or knowingly operates a massage
 parlor in violation of a prohibition or regulation adopted under
 this subchapter by the commissioners court.
 (b) An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 Sec. 234.106.  CUMULATIVE EFFECT. Authority under this
 subchapter is cumulative of other authority that a county has to
 regulate massage parlors and does not limit that other authority.
 Sec. 234.107.  EFFECT ON OTHER LAWS. (a)  This subchapter
 does not legalize anything prohibited under the Penal Code or other
 state law.
 (b)  A person who is subject to prosecution under this
 section and any other law may be prosecuted under either or both
 laws.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *