Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3108 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 3108
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 April 24, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 13, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 13, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3108 By: Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an interim study of recreational boating safety in
 Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. ADVISORY PANEL; STUDY. (a) The governor,
 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives
 shall each appoint three members to an advisory panel on
 recreational boating safety. The appointments by each shall
 include at least one representative from a boat dealer,
 distributor, or manufacturer licensed under Section 31.041, Parks
 and Wildlife Code.
 (b) The panel appointed under Subsection (a) of this section
 shall conduct a study assessing current conditions and making
 recommendations regarding:
 (1) boating safety generally and ways to improve
 boating safety on lakes and rivers in this state;
 (2) the effect of boater education on boating safety
 and the boat rental, boat sales, and tourism industries;
 (3) the effect of requiring every boat owner to carry
 liability insurance on boating safety and the boat rental, boat
 sales, and tourism industries;
 (4) the effectiveness of law enforcement on lakes and
 rivers and ways to increase the effectiveness of law enforcement,
 including possible increases in the number of enforcement officers
 and state or local responsibility for the increases; and
 (5) any other issue the advisory panel finds relevant
 to boating safety in this state.
 (c) For each area of the study, the panel shall provide an
 estimate of the costs to boaters and the boating and tourism
 industries if the panel's recommendations were implemented.
 (d) One member of the panel appointed by the governor shall
 serve as the panel's presiding officer.
 (e) The panel shall convene at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 (f) From the contingent expense fund of the senate and the
 contingent expense fund of the house of representatives equally,
 the members of the panel may be reimbursed for expenses incurred in
 carrying out the provisions of this Act in accordance with the rules
 of the senate and house of representatives and the policies of the
 senate and house committees on administration.
 (g) Not later than December 31, 2010, the panel shall report
 the results of the study conducted under this section to the Parks
 and Wildlife Department, the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the members of the
 committee in each house of the legislature with primary
 jurisdiction over recreational boating.
 SECTION 2. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September
 1, 2009.
 * * * * *