By: Flores (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 3114 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009; May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3114 By: Watson A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to continuing professional education requirements for land surveyors. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1071.305(a), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) As a condition for renewal of a certificate of registration, the board shall require a registered professional land surveyor to successfully complete continuing professional education courses as prescribed by board rule. The board's rules must provide that the continuing professional education requirement may be met by completing annually not more than [eight] sixteen hours[, a calendar day,] of professional development courses or programs. SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act to Section 1071.305, Occupations Code, applies only to a certificate of registration under Chapter 1071, Occupations Code, that expires on or after January 1, 2010. A certificate of registration that expires before January 1, 2010, is covered by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. (b) The Texas Board of Professional Land Surveying shall adopt rules under Section 1071.305, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, not later than November 1, 2009. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *