Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3114 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3114


 AN ACT
 relating to continuing professional education requirements for
 land surveyors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1071.305(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) As a condition for renewal of a certificate of
 registration, the board shall require a registered professional
 land surveyor to successfully complete continuing professional
 education courses as prescribed by board rule. The board's rules
 must provide that the continuing professional education
 requirement may be met by completing annually not more than 16
 [eight] hours[, a calendar day,] of professional development
 courses or programs.
 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act to
 Section 1071.305, Occupations Code, applies only to a certificate
 of registration under Chapter 1071, Occupations Code, that expires
 on or after January 1, 2010. A certificate of registration that
 expires before January 1, 2010, is covered by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b) The Texas Board of Professional Land Surveying shall
 adopt rules under Section 1071.305, Occupations Code, as amended by
 this Act, not later than November 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3114 was passed by the House on April
 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 5, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3114 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 1,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3114 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor