Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3163 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R26521 JAM-D
 By: Davis of Dallas H.B. No. 3163
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3163:
 By: Pierson C.S.H.B. No. 3163


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to funding the housing trust fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2306.201, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), and
 (f) to read as follows:
 (b) The fund consists of:
 (1) appropriations or transfers made to the fund;
 (2) unencumbered fund balances;
 (3) public or private gifts, [or] grants, or
 donations;
 (4) investment income, including all interest,
 dividends, capital gains, or other income from the investment of
 any portion of the fund;
 (5) repayments received on loans made from the fund;
 and
 (6) funds from any other source.
 (c)  The department may accept gifts, grants, or donations
 for the housing trust fund. All funds received for the housing trust
 fund under Subsection (b) shall be deposited or transferred into
 the Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company.
 (d)  In addition to other amounts appropriated to the housing
 trust fund by the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, the amount of
 $10 million is appropriated out of the general revenue fund to the
 housing trust fund for the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2010,
 and the amount of $10 million is appropriated out of the general
 revenue fund to the housing trust fund for the state fiscal year
 ending August 31, 2011.
 (e)  The appropriations made by Senate Bill 1, Acts of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009 (the General
 Appropriations Act), out of the general revenue fund to the
 Department of Information Resources are reduced by $10 million for
 the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2010, and are reduced by $10
 million for the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2011.
 (f)  This subsection and Subsections (d) and (e) expire
 September 1, 2012.
 SECTION 2. To the extent of conflict and regardless of the
 relative dates of enactment, this Act prevails over any other Act
 enacted by the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.