Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3216 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3216
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3216 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to telephone or electronic mail notification to a
 respondent of a complaint filed with the Texas Ethics Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 571.123(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b) After a complaint is filed, the commission shall
 immediately attempt to contact and notify the respondent of the
 complaint by telephone or electronic mail. Not later than the fifth
 business day after the date a complaint is filed, the commission
 shall send written notice to the complainant and the respondent.
 The written notice to the complainant and the respondent must:
 (1) state whether the complaint complies with the form
 requirements of Section 571.122; and
 (2)  if applicable, include the information required by
 Section 571.124(e).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *