Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3221 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hancock H.B. No. 3221
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3221By: Estes By: Estes
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain required notifications regarding insurance
 claims and premiums.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 542.056, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows:
 (e)  If an insurer pays a claim not later than the 15th
 business day after the date the insurer receives all items,
 statements, and forms required by the insurer to secure final proof
 of loss, or not later than the 30th day if the insurer has a
 reasonable basis to believe that the loss that is the subject of the
 claim resulted from arson, the payment of the claim constitutes
 notice of acceptance and, notwithstanding Subsection (a), the
 insurer is not required to provide any other notice under this
 section.
 (f)  If an insurer makes a partial payment under this section
 or rejects any portion of a claim, the insurer shall include a
 written notice with the partial payment that states the reason for
 the rejection.
 (g)  For purposes of Subsections (e) and (f), payment
 includes an electronic funds transfer to an account identified by
 the claimant.
 SECTION 2. Section 550.002, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to
 read as follows:
 (b) An insurer receiving automatic premium payments through
 withdrawal of funds from a person's account, including an escrow
 account, as authorized by that person to pay premiums on insurance
 coverage provided through that insurer, may not increase the amount
 of funds to be withdrawn from the account to pay premiums on that
 coverage unless[:
 [(1)] the insurer, not later than the 30th day before
 the effective date of the increase in the premium payment amount,
 notifies the person of the increase by mailing a notice through the
 United States Postal Service.
 (b-1)  The notice must include the insurer's toll-free
 telephone number, mailing address, and electronic mail address, if
 applicable, through which the [and provides the] person [a postage
 prepaid form that] may [be used to] object to the increase described
 by Subsection (b). An objection made by the policyholder through a
 telephone call, mail, or electronic mail constitutes a valid
 objection for purposes of this section.
 (b-2)  The insurer may increase the amount of funds to be
 withdrawn from the account only if [; and
 [(2) neither] the insurer does not receive a valid
 [nor the financial institution receives written] objection to the
 increase on or before the fifth day before the date on which the
 increase is scheduled to take [takes] effect.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *