Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3309 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gattis (Senate Sponsor - Ogden) H.B. No. 3309
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3309 By: Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to consolidation of certain proceedings on an application
 for a certificate of convenience and necessity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 37, Utilities Code,
 is amended by adding Section 37.0541 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.0541.  CONSOLIDATION OF CERTAIN PROCEEDINGS.  The
 commission shall consolidate the proceeding on an application to
 obtain or amend a certificate of convenience and necessity for the
 construction of a transmission line with the proceeding on another
 application to obtain or amend a certificate of convenience and
 necessity for the construction of a transmission line if it is
 apparent from the applications or a motion to intervene in either
 proceeding that the transmission lines that are the subject of the
 separate proceedings share a common point of interconnection.  This
 section does not apply to a proceeding on an application for a
 certificate of convenience and necessity for a transmission line to
 serve a competitive renewable energy zone as part of a plan
 developed by the commission under Section 39.904(g)(2).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *