Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB331 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 16, 2009      TO: Honorable Edmund Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB331 by Pierson (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Alcoholic Beverage Code, Subchapter A, Chapter 11 by adding Section 11.14 requiring persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption to maintain a liability insurance policy.  The bill also requires the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission (TABC) to adopt rules relating to the changes required by the bill no later than December 31, 2009.  The bill would take effect on September 1, 2009 and apply to all persons who apply for a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on or after January 1, 2010, and to persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on January 1, 2010, regardless of when the permit or license was issued.   This analysis assumes all costs associated with the bill can be absorbed within TABCs current appropriations, but TABC states the bill may have an undetermined impact on revenue depending on whether establishments subject to the bills requirements choose to surrender their permits or licenses due to additional costs related to holding a permit or license. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission   LBB Staff:  JOB, JRO, GG, ESi    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 16, 2009





  TO: Honorable Edmund Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB331 by Pierson (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Edmund Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB331 by Pierson (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced

 Honorable Edmund Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 Honorable Edmund Kuempel, Chair, House Committee on Licensing & Administrative Procedures 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB331 by Pierson (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced

HB331 by Pierson (Relating to liability insurance for persons holding certain alcoholic beverage permits.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Alcoholic Beverage Code, Subchapter A, Chapter 11 by adding Section 11.14 requiring persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption to maintain a liability insurance policy.  The bill also requires the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission (TABC) to adopt rules relating to the changes required by the bill no later than December 31, 2009.  The bill would take effect on September 1, 2009 and apply to all persons who apply for a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on or after January 1, 2010, and to persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on January 1, 2010, regardless of when the permit or license was issued.   This analysis assumes all costs associated with the bill can be absorbed within TABCs current appropriations, but TABC states the bill may have an undetermined impact on revenue depending on whether establishments subject to the bills requirements choose to surrender their permits or licenses due to additional costs related to holding a permit or license.

The bill would amend the Alcoholic Beverage Code, Subchapter A, Chapter 11 by adding Section 11.14 requiring persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption to maintain a liability insurance policy.  The bill also requires the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission (TABC) to adopt rules relating to the changes required by the bill no later than December 31, 2009.  The bill would take effect on September 1, 2009 and apply to all persons who apply for a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on or after January 1, 2010, and to persons who hold a permit for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption on January 1, 2010, regardless of when the permit or license was issued.

 

This analysis assumes all costs associated with the bill can be absorbed within TABCs current appropriations, but TABC states the bill may have an undetermined impact on revenue depending on whether establishments subject to the bills requirements choose to surrender their permits or licenses due to additional costs related to holding a permit or license.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission

458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, JRO, GG, ESi

 JOB, JRO, GG, ESi