Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3385 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Coleman, Isett (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 3385
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the activation of the statewide alert system for
 abducted children.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 411.355(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) On the request of a local law enforcement agency, the
 department shall activate the alert system and notify appropriate
 participants in the alert system, as established by rule, if:
 (1) the local law enforcement agency believes that a
 child has been abducted, including a child who:
 (A) is younger than 14 years of age; and
 (B)  regardless of whether the child departed
 willingly with the other person, has been taken from the care and
 custody of the child's parent or legal guardian without the
 permission of the parent or legal guardian by another person who is:
 (i)  more than three years older than the
 child; and
 (ii)  not related to the child by any degree
 of consanguinity or affinity as defined under Subchapter B, Chapter
 573, Government Code;
 (2) the local law enforcement agency believes that the
 abducted child is in immediate danger of serious bodily injury or
 death or of becoming the victim of a sexual assault;
 (3) the local law enforcement agency confirms that a
 preliminary [an] investigation has taken place that verifies the
 abduction and eliminates alternative explanations for the child's
 disappearance; and
 (4) sufficient information is available to
 disseminate to the public that could assist in locating the child, a
 person suspected of abducting the child, or a vehicle suspected of
 being used in the abduction.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a request for the activation of the statewide alert system for
 abducted children under Section 411.355, Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, that is made on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A request for the activation of the statewide alert
 system for abducted children that is made before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the request was
 made, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *