H.B. No. 3433 AN ACT relating to the extended registration of a commercial fleet of motor vehicles. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 502.001, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows: (1-a) "Commercial fleet" means a group of at least 25 nonapportioned motor vehicles owned by a corporation, limited or general partnership, limited liability company, or other business entity and used for the business purposes of that entity. SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 502.0023 to read as follows: Sec. 502.0023. EXTENDED REGISTRATION OF COMMERCIAL FLEET MOTOR VEHICLES. (a) Notwithstanding Section 502.158(c), the department shall develop and implement a system of registration to allow an owner of a commercial fleet to register the motor vehicles in the commercial fleet for an extended registration period of not less than one year or more than eight years. The owner may select the number of years for registration under this section within that range and register the commercial fleet for that period. Payment for all registration fees for the entire registration period selected is due at the time of registration. (b) A system of extended registration under this section must allow the owner of a commercial fleet to register: (1) an entire commercial fleet in the county of the owner's residence or principal place of business; or (2) the motor vehicles in a commercial fleet that are operated most regularly in the same county. (c) In addition to the registration fees prescribed by Subchapter D, an owner registering a commercial fleet under this section shall pay: (1) an annual commercial fleet registration fee of $10 per motor vehicle in the fleet; and (2) except as provided by Subsection (e), a one-time license plate manufacturing fee of $1.50 for each fleet motor vehicle license plate. (d) A license plate issued under this section: (1) may, on request of the owner, include the name or logo of the business entity that owns the vehicle; (2) must include the expiration date of the registration period; and (3) does not require an annual registration insignia to be valid. (e) In addition to all other applicable registration fees, an owner registering a commercial fleet under this section shall pay a one-time license plate manufacturing fee of $8 for each set of plates issued that includes on the legend the name or logo of the business entity that owns the vehicle instead of the fee imposed by Subsection (c)(2). (f) If a motor vehicle registered under this section has a gross weight in excess of 10,000 pounds, the department shall also issue a registration card for the vehicle that is valid for the selected registration period. (g) The department shall adopt rules to implement this section, including rules on suspension from the commercial fleet program for failure to comply with this section or rules adopted under this section. (h) The department and the counties in their budgeting processes shall consider any temporary increases and resulting decreases in revenue that will result from the use of the process provided under this section. SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Section 501.0234, Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) This section does not apply to a motor vehicle: (1) that has been declared a total loss by an insurance company in the settlement or adjustment of a claim; (2) for which the certificate of title has been surrendered in exchange for: (A) a salvage vehicle title issued under this chapter; (B) a nonrepairable vehicle title issued under this chapter; (C) a certificate of authority issued under Subchapter D, Chapter 683; or (D) an ownership document issued by another state that is comparable to a document described by Paragraphs (A)-(C); [or] (3) with a gross weight in excess of 11,000 pounds; or (4) purchased by a commercial fleet buyer who is a full-service deputy under Section 502.114 and who utilizes the dealer title application process developed to provide a method to submit title transactions to the county in which the commercial fleet buyer is a full-service deputy. SECTION 4. Section 502.0022, Transportation Code, is repealed. SECTION 5. The Texas Department of Transportation shall adopt the rules and establish the system required under Section 502.0023, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2010. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3433 was passed by the House on May 8, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 3433 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3433 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor