Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3435 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hamilton H.B. No. 3435
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3435By: Jackson By: Jackson
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exempting certain utility property from impact fees and
 assessments in certain water districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 49.212, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (f), (g), (h), and (i) to read as follows:
 (f)  Except as provided by Subsections (g) and (h), a
 district may not impose an impact fee, standby fee, or assessment on
 the property, including the equipment, rights-of-way, easements,
 facilities, or improvements, of:
 (1)  an electric utility or a power generation company
 as defined by Section 31.002, Utilities Code;
 (2)  a gas utility as defined by Section 101.003 or
 121.001, Utilities Code, or a person who owns pipelines used for the
 transportation or sale of oil or gas or a product or constituent of
 oil or gas;
 (3)  a person who owns pipelines used for the
 transportation or sale of carbon dioxide;
 (4)  a telecommunications provider as defined by
 Section 51.002, Utilities Code; or
 (5)  a cable service provider or video service provider
 as defined by Section 66.002, Utilities Code.
 (g)  A district may impose an impact fee, standby fee, or
 assessment on property described by Subsection (f) that is used as
 office space.
 (h)  A district may impose an impact fee on property
 described by Subsection (f) on the same terms as the district
 imposes an impact fee on other property if the owner of the property
 requests water or sewer services for that property from the
 district.
 (i)  Subsection (f) does not affect a district's authority to
 impose an ad valorem tax on property in the boundaries of the
 district under this chapter or other law.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *