Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3508 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 14, 2009      TO: Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3508 by Guillen (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for certain private security officers.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3508, As Introduced: a positive impact of $19,200 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 14, 2009





  TO: Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3508 by Guillen (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for certain private security officers.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3508 by Guillen (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for certain private security officers.), As Introduced

 Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety 

 Honorable Tommy Merritt, Chair, House Committee on Public Safety 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3508 by Guillen (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for certain private security officers.), As Introduced

HB3508 by Guillen (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for certain private security officers.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3508, As Introduced: a positive impact of $19,200 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3508, As Introduced: a positive impact of $19,200 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 $9,600   2011 $9,600   2012 $9,600   2013 $9,600   2014 $9,600    


2010 $9,600
2011 $9,600
2012 $9,600
2013 $9,600
2014 $9,600

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain fromCounties   2010 $9,600 $2,250 $150   2011 $9,600 $2,250 $150   2012 $9,600 $2,250 $150   2013 $9,600 $2,250 $150   2014 $9,600 $2,250 $150   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain fromCounties   2010 $9,600 $2,250 $150   2011 $9,600 $2,250 $150   2012 $9,600 $2,250 $150   2013 $9,600 $2,250 $150   2014 $9,600 $2,250 $150  


2010 $9,600 $2,250 $150
2011 $9,600 $2,250 $150
2012 $9,600 $2,250 $150
2013 $9,600 $2,250 $150
2014 $9,600 $2,250 $150

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Transportation Code to require the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to issue specialty license plates for security officers registered with the Texas Private Security Board. The bill would establish a fee of $40 for the specialty plates and would specify that the fees, after the deduction of $8 for TxDOTs administrative expenses, are to be deposited to the credit of the General Revenue Fund and may only be appropriated to the Department of Public Safety (DPS) to fund the private security bureau.   The bill would take effect on September 1, 2009.

The bill would amend the Transportation Code to require the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to issue specialty license plates for security officers registered with the Texas Private Security Board. The bill would establish a fee of $40 for the specialty plates and would specify that the fees, after the deduction of $8 for TxDOTs administrative expenses, are to be deposited to the credit of the General Revenue Fund and may only be appropriated to the Department of Public Safety (DPS) to fund the private security bureau.

 

The bill would take effect on September 1, 2009.

Methodology

Based on the information and analysis provided by TxDOT, this analysis assumes 300 of the new specialty license plates would be issued each year at a fee of $40 each of which $7.50 would be deposited to the State Highway Fund for TxDOT administrative expenses; $0.50 would be credited to the counties; and $32 would be deposited to the General Revenue Fund. Based on the analysis of TxDOT and DPS, it is assumed any costs or duties associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be absorbed within existing resources. Note: This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. Legislative policy, implemented as Government Code 403.094, consolidated special funds (except those affected by constitutional, federal, or other restrictions) into the General Revenue Fund as of August 31, 1993 and eliminated all applicable statutory revenue dedications as of August 31, 1995. Each subsequent Legislature has reviewed bills that affect funds consolidation. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current Legislature.

Based on the information and analysis provided by TxDOT, this analysis assumes 300 of the new specialty license plates would be issued each year at a fee of $40 each of which $7.50 would be deposited to the State Highway Fund for TxDOT administrative expenses; $0.50 would be credited to the counties; and $32 would be deposited to the General Revenue Fund.

Based on the analysis of TxDOT and DPS, it is assumed any costs or duties associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be absorbed within existing resources.

Note: This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. Legislative policy, implemented as Government Code 403.094, consolidated special funds (except those affected by constitutional, federal, or other restrictions) into the General Revenue Fund as of August 31, 1993 and eliminated all applicable statutory revenue dedications as of August 31, 1995. Each subsequent Legislature has reviewed bills that affect funds consolidation. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current Legislature.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 405 Department of Public Safety, 601 Department of Transportation

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 405 Department of Public Safety, 601 Department of Transportation

LBB Staff: JOB, ESi, MW, TG

 JOB, ESi, MW, TG