Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3547 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Elkins (Senate Sponsor - Jackson) H.B. No. 3547
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2009;
 May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an order for the closure of unregistered dry cleaning
 facilities and dry cleaning drop stations by the Texas Commission
 on Environmental Quality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 374, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 374.2511 to read as follows:
 Sec. 374.2511.  CLOSURE OF UNREGISTERED FACILITY.  The
 commission may issue a notice of violation to the owner or operator
 of a dry cleaning facility or dry cleaning drop station that is not
 registered under Section 374.102. The notice must inform the owner
 or operator of the nature of the violation and state that the
 commission may order the dry cleaning facility or dry cleaning drop
 station to cease operation if the violation is not corrected within
 30 days after the receipt of the notice. If the owner or operator
 does not correct the violation within the prescribed time, the
 commission may order the dry cleaning facility or dry cleaning drop
 station to cease operation.
 SECTION 2. Section 374.2511, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a violation that occurs on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A violation that occurs
 before the effective date of this Act is covered by the law in
 effect on the date the violation occurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *