Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB358 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Flynn (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 358
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 21, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0, 1
 present not voting; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 358 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the seizure of the circuit board of a gambling device or
 equipment, altered gambling equipment, or gambling paraphernalia.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 18, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 18.095 to read as follows:
 Art. 18.095.  SEIZURE OF CIRCUIT BOARD OF GAMBLING DEVICE,
 EQUIPMENT, OR PARAPHERNALIA.  For purposes of this chapter, an
 officer directed under a search warrant to search for and seize a
 gambling device or equipment, altered gambling equipment, or
 gambling paraphernalia in the discretion of the officer may:
 (1)  seize only the programmable main circuit board of
 the device, equipment, or paraphernalia if that circuit board is
 designed as a subassembly or essential part of the device,
 equipment, or paraphernalia to provide the information necessary
 for the device, equipment, or paraphernalia to operate as a
 gambling device or equipment, altered gambling equipment, or
 gambling paraphernalia;
 (2) carry the circuit board before the magistrate; and
 (3)  retain custody of the circuit board as the
 property seized pursuant to the warrant as required under this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *