Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3583 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 24, 2009      TO: Honorable Pete Gallego, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3583 by Gallego (Relating to photograph and live lineup identification procedures in criminal cases.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would add Article 38.20 to Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, to require the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education (TCLEOSE), in consultation with state and local law enforcement agencies, to develop, adopt, and disseminate to all state and local law enforcement agencies in the state a model policy and associated training materials regarding administration of photograph and live lineup identification procedures. Each law enforcement agency in the state would be required to adopt a detailed written policy regarding administration of photograph and live lineup identification procedures that conform to requirements established by TCLEOSE. The bill provides minimum requirements that must be included in identification procedures. TCLEOSE would be required to meet requirements of the bill by March 1, 2010, and law enforcement agencies would be required to meet requirements placed on them by September 1, 2010. However, the bill would apply to any photograph or live lineup identification procedure conducted on or after the effective date of the bill, which would be September 1, 2009. Based on analysis by the Department of Public Safety and TCLEOSE, any costs to their agencies associated with implementing provisions of the bill could be absorbed within existing resources. Local Government Impact The fiscal impact to a local law enforcement agency would depend on what procedures are currently in place and how similar those already are to those imposed by provisions of the bill. For example, the Travis County Sheriff's Office and the Fort Bend County Sheriff's Office both report the procedures required in the bill are similar to their existing procedures and therefore, there would be little or no fiscal impact. The City of Abilene Police Department, however, anticipates that implementing provisions of the bill could result in increased operational costs of approximately $60,000 in fiscal year 2010, growing to $72,930 by fiscal year 2014, as well as $20,000 to $25,000 capital outlay in fiscal years 2010 and 2013; however, these additional costs are not significant in relation to the department's overall budget.     Source Agencies:405 Department of Public Safety, 407 Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education   LBB Staff:  JOB, ESi, DB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 24, 2009





  TO: Honorable Pete Gallego, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3583 by Gallego (Relating to photograph and live lineup identification procedures in criminal cases.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Pete Gallego, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3583 by Gallego (Relating to photograph and live lineup identification procedures in criminal cases.), As Introduced

 Honorable Pete Gallego, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Pete Gallego, Chair, House Committee on Criminal Jurisprudence 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3583 by Gallego (Relating to photograph and live lineup identification procedures in criminal cases.), As Introduced

HB3583 by Gallego (Relating to photograph and live lineup identification procedures in criminal cases.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would add Article 38.20 to Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, to require the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education (TCLEOSE), in consultation with state and local law enforcement agencies, to develop, adopt, and disseminate to all state and local law enforcement agencies in the state a model policy and associated training materials regarding administration of photograph and live lineup identification procedures. Each law enforcement agency in the state would be required to adopt a detailed written policy regarding administration of photograph and live lineup identification procedures that conform to requirements established by TCLEOSE. The bill provides minimum requirements that must be included in identification procedures. TCLEOSE would be required to meet requirements of the bill by March 1, 2010, and law enforcement agencies would be required to meet requirements placed on them by September 1, 2010. However, the bill would apply to any photograph or live lineup identification procedure conducted on or after the effective date of the bill, which would be September 1, 2009. Based on analysis by the Department of Public Safety and TCLEOSE, any costs to their agencies associated with implementing provisions of the bill could be absorbed within existing resources.

The bill would add Article 38.20 to Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, to require the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education (TCLEOSE), in consultation with state and local law enforcement agencies, to develop, adopt, and disseminate to all state and local law enforcement agencies in the state a model policy and associated training materials regarding administration of photograph and live lineup identification procedures. Each law enforcement agency in the state would be required to adopt a detailed written policy regarding administration of photograph and live lineup identification procedures that conform to requirements established by TCLEOSE. The bill provides minimum requirements that must be included in identification procedures.

TCLEOSE would be required to meet requirements of the bill by March 1, 2010, and law enforcement agencies would be required to meet requirements placed on them by September 1, 2010. However, the bill would apply to any photograph or live lineup identification procedure conducted on or after the effective date of the bill, which would be September 1, 2009.

Based on analysis by the Department of Public Safety and TCLEOSE, any costs to their agencies associated with implementing provisions of the bill could be absorbed within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

The fiscal impact to a local law enforcement agency would depend on what procedures are currently in place and how similar those already are to those imposed by provisions of the bill. For example, the Travis County Sheriff's Office and the Fort Bend County Sheriff's Office both report the procedures required in the bill are similar to their existing procedures and therefore, there would be little or no fiscal impact. The City of Abilene Police Department, however, anticipates that implementing provisions of the bill could result in increased operational costs of approximately $60,000 in fiscal year 2010, growing to $72,930 by fiscal year 2014, as well as $20,000 to $25,000 capital outlay in fiscal years 2010 and 2013; however, these additional costs are not significant in relation to the department's overall budget. 

Source Agencies: 405 Department of Public Safety, 407 Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education

405 Department of Public Safety, 407 Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education

LBB Staff: JOB, ESi, DB

 JOB, ESi, DB