Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3621 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3621


 AN ACT
 relating to certain charges included in a motor vehicle installment
 agreement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 348.006, Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 348.006. PRINCIPAL BALANCE; INCLUSION OF DOCUMENTARY
 FEE. (a) The principal balance under a retail installment contract
 is computed by:
 (1) adding:
 (A) the cash price of the motor vehicle;
 (B) each amount included in the retail
 installment contract for an itemized charge; and
 (C) subject to Subsection (c), a documentary fee
 for services rendered for or on behalf of the retail buyer in
 [preparing,] handling[,] and processing documents relating to the
 motor vehicle sale [and to the closing of the retail installment
 transaction]; and
 (2) subtracting from the results under Subdivision (1)
 the amount of the retail buyer's down payment in money, goods, or
 both.
 (b) The computation of the principal balance may include an
 amount authorized under Section 348.404(b).
 (c) For a documentary fee to be included in the principal
 balance of a retail installment contract:
 (1) the retail seller must charge the documentary fee
 to cash buyers and credit buyers;
 (2) the documentary fee may not exceed:
 (A) [$50] for a motor vehicle retail installment
 contract other than a contract for a commercial vehicle, [or] a
 reasonable amount agreed to by the retail seller and retail buyer
 for the documentary services; or
 (B) for a [heavy] commercial vehicle retail
 installment contract, an amount agreed to in writing by the retail
 seller and retail buyer; and
 (3) except for a buyer's order or retail installment
 contract for a commercial vehicle, the buyer's order and the retail
 installment contract must include:
 (A) a statement of the amount of the documentary
 fee; and
 (B) in reasonable proximity to the place in each
 where the amount of the documentary fee is disclosed, the following
 notice in type that is bold-faced, capitalized, underlined, or
 otherwise conspicuously set out from surrounding written material:
 "A DOCUMENTARY FEE IS NOT AN OFFICIAL FEE. A DOCUMENTARY FEE
 IS NOT REQUIRED BY LAW, BUT MAY BE CHARGED TO BUYERS FOR HANDLING
 DOCUMENTS [AND PERFORMING SERVICES] RELATING TO THE [CLOSING OF A]
 SALE. A DOCUMENTARY FEE MAY NOT EXCEED [$50 FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE
 CONTRACT OR] A REASONABLE AMOUNT AGREED TO BY THE PARTIES [FOR A
 HEAVY COMMERCIAL VEHICLE CONTRACT]. THIS NOTICE IS REQUIRED BY
 LAW."
 (d) A retail seller shall post the documentary fee notice
 prescribed in Subsection (c) so that it is clearly visible in each
 place where a vehicle sale is finalized. If the language primarily
 used in an oral sales presentation is not the same as the language
 in which the retail installment contract is written, the retail
 seller shall furnish to the retail buyer a written statement
 containing the notice set out in Subsection (c)(3)(B) in the
 language primarily used in the oral sales presentation.
 (e)  Prior to increasing the maximum amount of the
 documentary fee the retail seller charges, a retail seller shall
 provide written notice to the commissioner of the maximum amount of
 the documentary fee the retail seller intends to charge.  The
 commissioner may review the amount of a documentary fee for
 reasonableness.  In determining whether a fee charged by a retail
 seller is reasonable, the commissioner may consider the resources
 required by the retail seller to perform the retail seller's duties
 under state and federal law with respect to the handling and
 processing of documents relating to the sale and financing of a
 motor vehicle.  If the commissioner determines that a documentary
 fee charged is not reasonable, the commissioner may require that
 the documentary fee charged be reduced or suspended.
 (f)  A documentary fee charged in accordance with this
 section before September 1, 2009, is considered reasonable for
 purposes of this section.
 (g) This section does not:
 (1) create a private right of action; or
 (2)  require that the commissioner approve a specific
 documentary fee amount before a retail seller charges the fee.
 (h)  The finance commission may adopt rules, including rules
 relating to the standards for a reasonableness determination or
 disclosures, necessary to enforce this section.  A rule adopted
 under this subsection may not require a retail seller to submit to
 the commissioner for prior approval the amount of a documentary fee
 that the retail seller intends to charge under this section.
 (i)  The commissioner has exclusive jurisdiction to enforce
 this section.
 (j)  Subsections (d), (e), and (h) do not apply with respect
 to a retail installment transaction for the purchase of a
 commercial vehicle.
 SECTION 2. To the extent of conflict and regardless of the
 relative dates of enactment, this Act prevails over any other bill,
 including House Bill 4361 and Senate Bill 1965, enacted by the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3621 was passed by the House on May
 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 3 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3621 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3621 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 1, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3621 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3621 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor