Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3625 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Elkins (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 3625
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to deadlines regarding certain preauthorization requests
 affecting workers' compensation health care networks.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1305.353(d), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d) For services not described under Subsection (e) or (f),
 the determination under Subsection (c) must be issued and
 transmitted not later than the third working [calendar] day after
 the date the request is received. For the purposes of this
 subsection, "working day" has the meaning assigned by Section
 4201.002.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to review of a workers' compensation benefit requiring
 preauthorization under Chapter 1305, Insurance Code, that is
 initiated on or after the effective date of this Act. A review
 initiated before that date is governed by the law in effect on the
 date that the review was initiated, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *