Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3635 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 3635
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2009;
 May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 22, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3635 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to administration of a trust with cotrustees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 113.085(c) and (d), Property Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) A cotrustee shall participate in the performance of a
 trustee's function unless the cotrustee:
 (1) is unavailable to perform the function because of
 absence, illness, suspension under this code or other law,
 disqualification, if any, under this code, disqualification under
 other law, or other temporary incapacity; or
 (2) has delegated the performance of the function to
 another trustee in accordance with the terms of the trust or
 applicable law, has communicated the delegation to all other
 cotrustees, and has filed the delegation in the records of the
 trust.
 (d) If a cotrustee is unavailable to participate in the
 performance of a trustee's function for a reason described by
 Subsection (c)(1) and prompt action is necessary to achieve the
 efficient administration or purposes of the trust or to avoid
 injury to the trust property or a beneficiary, the remaining
 cotrustee or a majority of the remaining cotrustees may act for the
 trust.
 SECTION 2. Section 113.085, Property Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a trust existing on or after September 1,
 2009, regardless of the date the trust was created.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *