Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3661 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 3661
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 April 24, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 7, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 7, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to standards for installing fire hydrants in certain
 residential areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 341.0357(b), Health and Safety Code, as
 added by Chapter 861 (H.B. 1391), Acts of the 80th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The regulatory authority for a public utility shall by
 rule or ordinance adopt standards for installing fire hydrants and
 maintaining sufficient water pressure for service to fire hydrants
 adequate to protect public safety in residential areas in a
 municipality with a population of 1,000,000 or more.
 SECTION 2. Section 341.0358(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) The regulatory authority for a public utility shall by
 rule or ordinance adopt standards for installing fire hydrants and
 maintaining sufficient water pressure for service to fire hydrants
 adequate to protect public safety in residential areas in a
 municipality with a population of 1,000,000 or more.
 SECTION 3. (a) Section 1 of this Act takes effect only if
 the Act of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to
 nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in existing codes
 (H.B. 3545 or S.B. 1969) does not become law. If the Act of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to
 nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in existing codes
 (H.B. 3545 or S.B. 1969) becomes law, Section 1 of this Act has no
 effect.
 (b) Section 2 of this Act takes effect only if the Act of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to
 nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in existing codes
 (H.B. 3545 or S.B. 1969) becomes law. If the Act of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, relating to nonsubstantive
 additions to and corrections in existing codes (H.B. 3545 or
 S.B. 1969) does not become law, Section 2 of this Act has no effect.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *