Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3668 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hopson (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 3668
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2009;
 May 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 18, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the injunction of municipal purchasing contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 252.061, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 252.061. INJUNCTION. If the contract is made without
 compliance with this chapter, it is void and the performance of the
 contract, including the payment of any money under the contract,
 may be enjoined by:
 (1) any property tax paying resident of the
 municipality; or
 (2)  a person who submitted a bid for a contract for
 which the competitive sealed bidding requirement applies,
 regardless of residency, if the contract is for the construction of
 public works.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a contract entered into on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A contract entered into before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *