Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3751 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallego, Moody (Senate Sponsor - Shapiro) H.B. No. 3751
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3751 By: Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the conditions of bond for a defendant charged with
 committing certain offenses against a child and to the denial of
 bail pending trial with respect to certain defendants who violate
 those conditions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Articles 17.41(a) and (b), Code of Criminal
 Procedure, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) This article applies to a defendant charged with an
 offense under any of the following provisions of the Penal Code, if
 committed against a child younger than 14 [12] years of age [or
 younger]:
 (1) Chapter 21 (Sexual Offenses) or 22 (Assaultive
 Offenses);
 (2) Section 25.02 (Prohibited Sexual Conduct); or
 (3) Section 43.25 (Sexual Performance by a Child).
 (b) Subject to Subsections (c) and (d), with respect to a
 defendant who is charged with an offense described by Subsection
 (a), a [A] magistrate may require as a condition of bond, if an
 attorney representing the state is present at the time the
 magistrate sets the conditions of the defendant's bond, and shall
 require as a condition of bond, if an attorney representing the
 state is not present at the time the magistrate sets the conditions
 of the defendant's bond, [for a defendant charged with an offense
 described by Subsection (a) of this article] that the defendant
 not:
 (1) directly communicate with the alleged victim of
 the offense; or
 (2) go near a residence, school, or other location, as
 specifically described in the bond, frequented by the alleged
 victim.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 17, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 17.153 to read as follows:
 Art. 17.153.  DENIAL OF BAIL FOR VIOLATION OF CONDITION OF
 BOND WHERE CHILD ALLEGED VICTIM. (a) This article applies to a
 defendant charged with a felony offense under any of the following
 provisions of the Penal Code, if committed against a child younger
 than 14 years of age:
 (1)  Chapter 21 (Sexual Offenses) or 22 (Assaultive
 Offenses);
 (2) Section 25.02 (Prohibited Sexual Conduct); or
 (3) Section 43.25 (Sexual Performance by a Child).
 (b)  A defendant described by Subsection (a) who violates a
 condition of bond set under Article 17.41 and whose bail in the case
 is revoked for the violation may be taken into custody and denied
 release on bail pending trial if, following a hearing, a judge or
 magistrate determines by a preponderance of the evidence that the
 defendant violated a condition of bond related to the safety of the
 victim of the offense or the safety of the community. If the
 magistrate finds that the violation occurred, the magistrate may
 revoke the defendant's bond and order that the defendant be
 immediately returned to custody. Once the defendant is placed in
 custody, the revocation of the defendant's bond discharges the
 sureties on the bond, if any, from any future liability on the bond.
 A discharge under this subsection from any future liability on the
 bond does not discharge any surety from liability for previous
 forfeitures on the bond.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *