Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3827 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hancock (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 3827
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the delivery of regulated substances into underground
 storage tanks; providing a penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 7.156(c), Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (c) A person commits an offense if the person:
 (1) is an owner or operator of an underground storage
 tank regulated under Chapter 26 into which any regulated substance
 is delivered unless the underground storage tank has been issued a
 valid, current underground storage tank registration and
 certificate of compliance under Section 26.346; or
 (2)  physically delivers any regulated substance into
 an underground storage tank regulated under Chapter 26 unless the
 underground storage tank has been issued a valid, current
 underground storage tank registration and certificate of
 compliance under Section 26.346.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 7, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 7.256 to read as follows:
 Sec. 7.256.  DEFENSE TO DELIVERY OF REGULATED SUBSTANCE INTO
 UNDERGROUND STORAGE TANK. It is an affirmative defense to
 prosecution under Section 7.156(c)(2) that the person delivering a
 regulated substance into an underground storage tank relied on:
 (1)  a valid paper delivery certificate presented by
 the owner or operator of the underground storage tank or displayed
 at the facility associated with the underground storage tank;
 (2)  a temporary delivery authorization presented by
 the owner or operator of the underground storage tank or displayed
 at the facility associated with the underground storage tank; or
 (3)  registration and self-certification information
 for the underground storage tank obtained from the commission's
 Internet website not more than 30 days before the date of delivery.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *