Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB389 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zerwas (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 389
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for expedited credentialing of certain
 physicians by managed care plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1452.101(5), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (5) "Medical group" means:
 (A)  a single legal entity owned by two or more
 physicians;
 (B) a professional association composed of
 licensed physicians; [corporation] or
 (C) any other business entity composed of
 licensed physicians as permitted under Subchapter B, Chapter 162,
 Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to credentialing of a physician under a contract entered into or
 renewed by a medical group and an issuer of a managed care plan on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A contract entered into or
 renewed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect immediately before that date, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *