Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB392 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bohac, et al. H.B. No. 392
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 392By: Deuell By: Deuell
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 11, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; May 11, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability and use of automated external
 defibrillators in nursing homes and related institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.159 to read as follows:
 Sec. 242.159.  AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATORS. (a)  An
 institution shall have available for use at the institution an
 automated external defibrillator, as defined by Section 779.001,
 and shall comply with the training, use, and notification
 requirements of Chapter 779.
 (b)  An institution that does not have funds available for
 purposes of Subsection (a) may solicit gifts, grants, or donations
 to purchase or maintain an automated external defibrillator for use
 at the institution.
 (c)  An institution may not use an automated external
 defibrillator to treat a resident of the institution who has issued
 or executed an out-of-hospital do-not-resuscitate order under
 Subchapter C, Chapter 166.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Section 74.151(b), Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, Section 74.151(a), Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 applies to administration of emergency care using an automated
 external defibrillator by an employee or volunteer at an
 institution.
 (e)  An institution shall employ at least one person who is
 trained in the proper use of an automated external defibrillator.
 (e-1)  An institution is not required to comply with
 Subsections (a) and (e) until September 1, 2012.  This subsection
 expires January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *