H.B. No. 392 AN ACT relating to the availability and use of automated external defibrillators in nursing homes and related institutions. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 242, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 242.159 to read as follows: Sec. 242.159. AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATORS. (a) An institution shall have available for use at the institution an automated external defibrillator, as defined by Section 779.001, and shall comply with the training, use, and notification requirements of Chapter 779. (b) An institution that does not have funds available for purposes of Subsection (a) may solicit gifts, grants, or donations to purchase or maintain an automated external defibrillator for use at the institution. (c) The use of an automated external defibrillator must be consistent with a resident's advance directive executed or issued under Subchapter C, Chapter 166. (d) Notwithstanding Section 74.151(b), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, Section 74.151(a), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, applies to administration of emergency care using an automated external defibrillator by an employee or volunteer at an institution. (e) An institution shall employ at least one person who is trained in the proper use of an automated external defibrillator. (e-1) An institution is not required to comply with Subsections (a) and (e) until September 1, 2012. This subsection expires January 1, 2013. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 392 was passed by the House on April 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 392 on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 392 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor