Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3942 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R5230 JTS-D
 By: Truitt H.B. No. 3942


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot test of an advanced control technology for the
 reduction of nitrogen oxides emissions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION TECHNOLOGY PILOT.
 (a) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall select one
 dry process cement kiln stack in a nonattainment or a near
 nonattainment area for the purpose of a pilot test to determine the
 effectiveness of a selective catalytic reduction technology as an
 advanced control technology for reducing the nitrogen oxides
 emissions from the cement kiln stack. The Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality shall select a selective catalytic reduction
 technology vendor to provide the selective catalytic reduction
 technology needed to conduct the testing required by this
 subsection.
 (b) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall:
 (1) design, supervise, and monitor the testing
 required by Subsection (a) of this section in consultation with:
 (A) the selective catalytic reduction technology
 vendor selected by the commission;
 (B) the owner or operator of the cement kiln
 stack selected for testing under Subsection (a) of this section;
 and
 (C) representatives of a regional council of
 government of the region in which the cement kiln is located; and
 (2) verify the accuracy of the results of the testing.
 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality may
 accept and hold a gift or grant conditioned on its use for testing
 advanced controls for nitrogen oxides emissions from cement kilns
 in a nonattainment or near nonattainment area and use such gifts or
 grants without an appropriation for the pilot test under this
 section.
 (d) If this Act takes effect before July 31, 2009, the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality shall:
 (1) not later than July 31, 2009, select a dry process
 cement kiln stack for testing as required under Subsection (a) of
 this section;
 (2) not later than August 31, 2009, select a selective
 catalytic reduction technology vendor as required under Subsection
 (a) of this section; and
 (3) not later than November 30, 2009, begin testing
 the selective catalytic reduction technology.
 (e) If this Act takes effect on or after July 31, 2009, the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall:
 (1) not later than September 30, 2009, select a dry
 process cement kiln stack for testing as required under Subsection
 (a) of this section;
 (2) not later than October 31, 2009, select a
 selective catalytic reduction technology vendor as required under
 Subsection (a) of this section; and
 (3) not later than January 1, 2009, begin testing the
 selective catalytic reduction technology.
 (f) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall:
 (1) not later than December 31, 2010, complete the
 selective catalytic reduction technology testing required under
 Subsection (a) of this section; and
 (2) not later than January 1, 2011, prepare and
 deliver to each member of the legislature a report describing:
 (A) the results of the testing, including whether
 any reduction in nitrogen oxides emissions resulted from the use of
 the selective catalytic reduction technology; and
 (B) the costs involved in the installation, use,
 and maintenance of the selective catalytic reduction technology.
 SECTION 2. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.