Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4009 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Weber, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 4009
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2009;
 May 18, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a victim assistance program to
 provide services to domestic victims of trafficking.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 531, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter J-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J-1. ASSISTANCE PROGRAM FOR DOMESTIC VICTIMS OF
 TRAFFICKING
 Sec. 531.381. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Domestic victim" means a victim of trafficking
 who is a permanent legal resident or citizen of the United States.
 (2)  "Victim of trafficking" has the meaning assigned
 by 22 U.S.C. Section 7102.
 Sec. 531.382.  VICTIM ASSISTANCE PROGRAM ESTABLISHED. The
 commission shall develop and implement a program designed to assist
 domestic victims, including victims who are children, in accessing
 necessary services. The program must consist of at least the
 following components:
 (1)  a searchable database of assistance programs for
 domestic victims, including programs that provide mental health
 services, other health services, services to meet victims' basic
 needs, case management services, and any other services the
 commission considers appropriate, that may be used to match victims
 with appropriate resources;
 (2) the grant program described by Section 531.383;
 (3)  recommended training programs for judges,
 prosecutors, and law enforcement personnel; and
 (4)  an outreach initiative to ensure that victims,
 judges, prosecutors, and law enforcement personnel are aware of the
 availability of services through the program.
 Sec. 531.383.  GRANT PROGRAM. (a) Subject to available
 funds, the commission shall establish a grant program to award
 grants to public and nonprofit organizations that provide
 assistance to domestic victims, including organizations that
 provide public awareness activities, community outreach and
 training, victim identification services, and legal services.
 (b)  To apply for a grant under this section, an applicant
 must submit an application in the form and manner prescribed by the
 commission. An applicant must describe in the application the
 services the applicant intends to provide to domestic victims if
 the grant is awarded.
 (c)  In awarding grants under this section, the commission
 shall give preference to organizations that have experience in
 successfully providing the types of services for which the grants
 are awarded.
 (d)  A grant recipient shall provide reports as required by
 the commission regarding the use of grant funds.
 (e)  Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the commission shall submit a report to the legislature summarizing
 the activities, funding, and outcomes of programs awarded a grant
 under this section and providing recommendations regarding the
 grant program.
 Sec. 531.384.  TRAINING PROGRAMS. The commission, with
 assistance from the Office of Court Administration of the Texas
 Judicial System, the Department of Public Safety, and local law
 enforcement agencies, shall create training programs designed to
 increase the awareness of judges, prosecutors, and law enforcement
 personnel of the needs of domestic victims, the availability of
 services under this subchapter, the database of services described
 by Section 531.382, and potential funding sources for those
 services.
 Sec. 531.385.  FUNDING. (a) The commission may use
 appropriated funds and may accept gifts, grants, and donations from
 any sources for purposes of the victim assistance program
 established under this subchapter.
 (b)  The commission shall conduct a study regarding
 additional funding strategies for the victim assistance program.
 In conducting the study, the commission, in cooperation with
 appropriate governmental entities, shall identify appropriate
 revenue streams, which may include revenue derived from:
 (1)  revenue streams similar to those used to fund
 crime victims' compensation under Subchapter B, Chapter 56, Code of
 Criminal Procedure;
 (2)  imposing additional court costs on defendants on
 conviction of certain offenses;
 (3)  imposing additional fees on the filing of civil
 cases;
 (4)  acquiring from law enforcement agencies the
 proceeds from assets seized or forfeited under state or federal
 law; and
 (5) any other source identified by the commission.
 (c)  The commission shall submit a report regarding the
 results of the study conducted under Subsection (b) to the 82nd
 Legislature not later than December 1, 2010. The report must
 include the commission's findings regarding appropriate revenue
 streams for the victim assistance program, proposed legislation
 necessary to receive the revenue for that purpose, and proposed
 legislation regarding the establishment of a dedicated account to
 which the revenue may be credited.
 (d)  This subsection and Subsections (b) and (c) expire
 January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *