Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4063 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R10195 BEF-F
 By: Gonzalez Toureilles H.B. No. 4063


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the periods for applying for and receiving designation
 of a well as a two-year inactive well for purposes of the oil and gas
 severance tax exemption.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 202.056(c) and (d), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) If the commission designates a three-year inactive well
 under this section, it shall issue a certificate designating the
 well as a three-year inactive well as defined by Subsection (a)(3)
 of this section. The commission may not designate a three-year
 inactive well under this section after February 29, 1996. If the
 commission designates a two-year inactive well under this section,
 it shall issue a certificate designating the well as a two-year
 inactive well as defined by Subsection (a)(4) of this section. The
 commission may not designate a two-year inactive well under this
 section after February 28, 2020 [2010].
 (d) An application for three-year inactive well
 certification shall be made during the period of September 1, 1993,
 through August 31, 1995, to qualify for the tax exemption under this
 section. An application for two-year inactive well certification
 shall be made during the period September 1, 1997, through August
 31, 2019 [2009], to qualify for the tax exemption under this
 section. Hydrocarbons sold after the date of certification are
 eligible for the tax exemption.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.