Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4064 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 18, 2009      TO: Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB4064 by Gonzalez Toureilles (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for cancer of unknown primary origin awareness.), As Engrossed   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4064, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 18, 2009





  TO: Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB4064 by Gonzalez Toureilles (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for cancer of unknown primary origin awareness.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB4064 by Gonzalez Toureilles (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for cancer of unknown primary origin awareness.), As Engrossed

 Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security 

 Honorable John Carona, Chair, Senate Committee on Transportation & Homeland Security 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB4064 by Gonzalez Toureilles (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for cancer of unknown primary origin awareness.), As Engrossed

HB4064 by Gonzalez Toureilles (Relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for cancer of unknown primary origin awareness.), As Engrossed

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4064, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4064, As Engrossed: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 $0   2011 $0   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0    


2010 $0
2011 $0
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain fromCounties Probable Revenue Gain fromCancer Prevention and Research Fund5136    2010 $2,250 $150 $6,600   2011 $2,250 $150 $6,600   2012 $2,250 $150 $6,600   2013 $2,250 $150 $6,600   2014 $2,250 $150 $6,600   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain fromCounties Probable Revenue Gain fromCancer Prevention and Research Fund5136    2010 $2,250 $150 $6,600   2011 $2,250 $150 $6,600   2012 $2,250 $150 $6,600   2013 $2,250 $150 $6,600   2014 $2,250 $150 $6,600  


2010 $2,250 $150 $6,600
2011 $2,250 $150 $6,600
2012 $2,250 $150 $6,600
2013 $2,250 $150 $6,600
2014 $2,250 $150 $6,600

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Transportation Code to require the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to issue specialty license plates to raise awareness of cancer of unknown primary origin.  The bill would require that, after deduction for administrative costs, the fees for issuance of the license plates be deposited to the Cancer Prevention and Research Fund.  The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.

The bill would amend the Transportation Code to require the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT) to issue specialty license plates to raise awareness of cancer of unknown primary origin.  The bill would require that, after deduction for administrative costs, the fees for issuance of the license plates be deposited to the Cancer Prevention and Research Fund.

 

Methodology

Based on the information and analysis provided by TxDOT, this analysis assumes 300 of the new specialty license plates would be issued each year at a fee of $30 each of which $7.50 would be deposited to the State Highway Fund for TxDOT administrative expenses; $0.50 would be retained by the counties; and $22 would be deposited to the Cancer Prevention and Research Fund Account in the General Revenue Fund. Based on the analysis of TxDOT, it is assumed any costs or duties associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be absorbed within existing resources. Note: This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. Legislative policy, implemented as Government Code 403.094, consolidated special funds (except those affected by constitutional, federal, or other restrictions) into the General Revenue Fund as of August 31, 1993, and eliminated all applicable statutory revenue dedications as of August 31, 1995. Each subsequent Legislature has reviewed bills that affect funds consolidation. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current Legislature.

Based on the information and analysis provided by TxDOT, this analysis assumes 300 of the new specialty license plates would be issued each year at a fee of $30 each of which $7.50 would be deposited to the State Highway Fund for TxDOT administrative expenses; $0.50 would be retained by the counties; and $22 would be deposited to the Cancer Prevention and Research Fund Account in the General Revenue Fund.

Based on the analysis of TxDOT, it is assumed any costs or duties associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be absorbed within existing resources.

Note: This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. Legislative policy, implemented as Government Code 403.094, consolidated special funds (except those affected by constitutional, federal, or other restrictions) into the General Revenue Fund as of August 31, 1993, and eliminated all applicable statutory revenue dedications as of August 31, 1995. Each subsequent Legislature has reviewed bills that affect funds consolidation. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current Legislature.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 601 Department of Transportation

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 601 Department of Transportation

LBB Staff: JOB, KJG, MW, TG

 JOB, KJG, MW, TG