Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4067 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R13872 PMO-D
 By: Gonzales H.B. No. 4067


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Bureau for Economic Development of
 the Border Region.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle E, Title 4, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 471 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 471. BUREAU FOR ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF THE BORDER REGION
 Sec. 471.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Border region" means the portion of this state
 located within 100 kilometers of this state's international border.
 (2)  "Bureau" means the Bureau for Economic Development
 of the Border Region.
 Sec. 471.002.  BUREAU; MEMBERS.  (a) The bureau is an agency
 of the state.
 (b)  The bureau consists of nine members appointed as
 follows:
 (1) two members appointed by the governor;
 (2) two members appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (3) two members appointed by the speaker of the house;
 (4)  one member appointed by the secretary of state;
 and
 (5) as ex officio members, the chairperson of:
 (A)  the House Committee on Border and
 Intergovernmental Affairs; and
 (B)  the senate committee to which border affairs
 are referred.
 (c)  Bureau members shall be selected to provide the bureau
 technical expertise in financial planning and development,
 construction, engineering, trade, and other appropriate criteria.
 Sec. 471.003.  TERMS.  Appointed members serve staggered
 terms of two years, with as near as possible to one-half of the
 members' terms expiring February 1 of each year.
 Sec. 471.004.  MEETINGS; OFFICERS; OFFICE.  (a) The bureau
 shall hold at least one regular meeting in the first quarter of each
 calendar year.
 (b)  At its first meeting in each odd-numbered year, the
 bureau shall select from its membership a chairperson.
 (c)  The bureau shall meet subject to the call of the
 chairperson.
 Sec. 471.005.  EXPENSES.  A member of the bureau is entitled
 to reimbursement for expenses incurred for service on the bureau,
 as provided by the General Appropriations Act. A member may not
 receive any compensation for that service.
 Sec. 471.006.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The bureau is subject to
 Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as
 provided by that chapter, the bureau is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2021.
 Sec. 471.007. DUTIES. The bureau shall:
 (1)  draft and submit reports to advise the legislature
 about economic development opportunities in the border region;
 (2)  provide evaluation of specific proposals for use
 of economic development funds in the border region, including tax
 abatement agreements;
 (3)  consult with the Texas Economic Development and
 Tourism Office within the office of the governor on issues related
 to the border region;
 (4)  study and report on opportunities to improve trade
 across the international border;
 (5)  consult with the division of planning coordination
 within the governor's office under Section 772.004 about issues
 related to the border region that mutually concern the bureau and
 the division; and
 (6)  make recommendations to the legislature about
 establishment of infrastructure projects to assist multiple
 counties in the border region.
 Sec. 471.008.  GIFTS AND GRANTS.  The bureau may accept gifts
 and grants from any source to be used to carry out the bureau's
 duties.  The bureau shall actively seek gifts from businesses and
 organizations that represent businesses to support the bureau's
 functions.
 SECTION 2. In appointing the initial appointed members of
 the Bureau for Economic Development of the Border Region, as added
 by this Act:
 (1) the governor shall appoint one member to serve a
 term expiring February 1, 2010, and one member to serve a term
 expiring February 1, 2011;
 (2) the lieutenant governor shall appoint one member
 to serve a term expiring February 1, 2010, and one member to serve a
 term expiring February 1, 2011;
 (3) the speaker of the house of representatives shall
 appoint one member to serve a term expiring February 1, 2010, and
 one member to serve a term expiring February 1, 2011; and
 (4) the secretary of state shall appoint one member to
 serve a term expiring February 1, 2011.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.