Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4127 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hartnett (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 4127
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4127 By: Shapleigh


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the expenditure of public funds for certain playground
 facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 756.061(a) and (b), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) Notwithstanding any other rule or statute, and except
 [Except] as provided by Subsection (b), on or after September 1,
 2009 [1997], public funds may not be used:
 (1) to purchase playground equipment that:
 (A) does not [substantially] comply with each
 applicable provision of ASTM Standard F1487-07ae1, "Consumer
 Safety Performance Specification for Playground Equipment for
 Public Use" [the Handbook for Public Playground Safety] published
 [in 1994] by ASTM International; or
 (B)  has a horizontal bare metal platform or a
 bare metal step or slide, unless the bare metal is shielded from
 direct sun by a covering provided with the equipment or by a shaded
 area in the location where the equipment is installed [the United
 States Consumer Product Safety Commission (Publication No. 325)];
 (2) to purchase surfacing for the area under and
 around playground equipment if the surfacing will not
 [substantially] comply, on completion of installation of the
 surfacing, with each applicable provision of ASTM Standard
 F2223-04e1, "Standard Guide for ASTM Standards on Playground
 Surfacing" published by ASTM International [the handbook described
 by Subdivision (1)]; or
 (3) to pay for installation of playground equipment or
 surfacing if the installation will not [substantially] comply, on
 completion of the installation, with each applicable provision of
 the specifications [handbook] described by Subdivision (1) or (2),
 as applicable.
 (b) Public funds may be used for maintenance of playground
 equipment or surfacing for the area under and around playground
 equipment that was purchased before September 1, 2009 [1997], even
 if the equipment or surfacing does not [substantially] comply, on
 completion of the maintenance, with each applicable provision of
 the specifications [handbook] described by Subsections
 [Subsection] (a)(1) and (a)(2).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *