By: Rose, Branch (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4149 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009; May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4149 By: Zaffirini A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to certain studies and reports by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding achievable cost-saving measures and the use and availability of electronic textbooks at institutions of higher education. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 61.0664 to read as follows: Sec. 61.0664. STUDY OF ACHIEVABLE COST-SAVING MEASURES; REPORT. (a) The board shall conduct a study to identify achievable cost-saving measures in the management and operation of institutions of higher education. (b) Not later than January 31, 2011, the board shall report the results of the study required by Subsection (a) to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and presiding officer for each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education. The report must include: (1) the board's recommendations concerning cost-saving measures that are achievable at institutions of higher education; and (2) an estimate of the amount of money that would be saved during a five-year period through the implementation of each recommendation. (c) This section expires January 31, 2011. SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 61.0665 to read as follows: Sec. 61.0665. STUDY ON USE AND AVAILABILITY OF ELECTRONIC TEXTBOOKS. (a) The board shall conduct a study and recommend policies regarding the use and availability of electronic textbooks in higher education in this state and in other states. The study and policy recommendations must include a specific focus on the results of the pilot program implemented by The University of Texas at Austin with respect to the use of electronic textbooks and must address methods for encouraging the use of electronic textbooks at public or private institutions of higher education in this state. (b) Each student regent serving under Section 51.355 or 51.356 shall assist the board in performing the board's duties under Subsection (a). The board shall establish procedures to assist a student regent in complying with this subsection. (c) The board may solicit and accept gifts and grants from any public or private source to conduct the study and develop policy recommendations under this section. (d) Not later than December 1, 2010, the board shall make an initial report and recommendations based on the study to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education. This subsection expires January 31, 2011. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *