Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4189 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rose (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 4189
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the conduct of compliance programs by institutions of
 higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.971 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.971. COMPLIANCE PROGRAM. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Compliance program" means a process to assess and
 ensure compliance by the officers and employees of an institution
 of higher education with applicable laws, rules, regulations, and
 policies, including matters of:
 (A) ethics and standards of conduct;
 (B) financial reporting;
 (C) internal accounting controls; or
 (D) auditing.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  An institution of higher education that maintains a
 compliance program may establish procedures, such as a telephone
 hotline, to permit private access to the compliance program office
 and to preserve the confidentiality of communications and the
 anonymity of a person making a compliance report or participating
 in a compliance investigation.
 (c) The following are confidential:
 (1)  information that directly or indirectly reveals
 the identity of an individual who made a report to the compliance
 program office of an institution of higher education, sought
 guidance from the office, or participated in an investigation
 conducted under the compliance program; and
 (2)  information that directly or indirectly reveals
 the identity of an individual as a person who is alleged to have or
 may have planned, initiated, or participated in activities that are
 the subject of a report made to the compliance program office of an
 institution of higher education if, after completing an
 investigation, the office determines the report to be
 unsubstantiated or without merit.
 (d)  Subsection (c) does not apply to information related to
 an individual who consents to disclosure of the information.
 (e)  Information produced in a compliance program
 investigation the release of which would interfere with an ongoing
 compliance investigation is excepted from disclosure under Chapter
 552, Government Code.
 (f)  Information made confidential or excepted from public
 disclosure by this section may be made available to a law
 enforcement agency or prosecutor for official purposes of the
 agency or prosecutor upon proper request made in compliance with
 applicable law and procedure.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *