Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4189 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 4189


 AN ACT
 relating to the conduct of compliance programs by institutions of
 higher education and to the vaccination of students of institutions
 of higher education against bacterial meningitis.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the Jamie Schanbaum
 Act.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9192 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9192.  BACTERIAL MENINGITIS VACCINATION REQUIRED
 FOR CERTAIN STUDENTS; EXCEPTIONS.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Health practitioner" means any person authorized
 by law to administer an immunization.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" and "private or
 independent institution of higher education" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  This section applies only to a first-time student of an
 institution of higher education or private or independent
 institution of higher education, including a transfer student, who
 resides in, or has applied for on-campus housing and been approved
 to reside in, an on-campus dormitory or other on-campus student
 housing facility at the institution.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), a student to whom
 this section applies or a parent or guardian of the student must
 provide to the institution, at the time and in the manner prescribed
 by rules adopted by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board,
 a certificate signed by a health practitioner evidencing that the
 student has been vaccinated against bacterial meningitis.
 (d)  A student to whom this section applies or a parent or
 guardian of the student is not required to comply with Subsection
 (c) if the student or a parent or guardian of the student submits to
 the institution:
 (1)  an affidavit or a certificate signed by a
 physician who is duly registered and licensed to practice medicine
 in the United States in which it is stated that, in the physician's
 opinion, the vaccination required would be injurious to the health
 and well-being of the student; or
 (2)  an affidavit signed by the student stating that
 the student declines the vaccination for bacterial meningitis for
 reasons of conscience, including a religious belief, except that
 the exemption provided by this subdivision does not apply during a
 disaster or public health emergency, terrorist attack, hostile
 military or paramilitary action, or extraordinary law enforcement
 emergency declared by an appropriate official or other authority
 and in effect for the location of the institution the student
 attends.
 (e)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, in
 consultation with institutions of higher education and private or
 independent institutions of higher education, shall adopt rules for
 the administration of this section, including rules establishing
 the date by which a student who is required to comply with
 Subsection (c) must have received the vaccination required by that
 subsection, which may not be later than the date the student
 initially moves into an on-campus dormitory or other on-campus
 student housing facility at an institution.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.971 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.971. COMPLIANCE PROGRAM. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Compliance program" means a process to assess and
 ensure compliance by the officers and employees of an institution
 of higher education with applicable laws, rules, regulations, and
 policies, including matters of:
 (A) ethics and standards of conduct;
 (B) financial reporting;
 (C) internal accounting controls; or
 (D) auditing.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  An institution of higher education that maintains a
 compliance program may establish procedures, such as a telephone
 hotline, to permit private access to the compliance program office
 and to preserve the confidentiality of communications and the
 anonymity of a person making a compliance report or participating
 in a compliance investigation.
 (c) The following are confidential:
 (1)  information that directly or indirectly reveals
 the identity of an individual who made a report to the compliance
 program office of an institution of higher education, sought
 guidance from the office, or participated in an investigation
 conducted under the compliance program; and
 (2)  information that directly or indirectly reveals
 the identity of an individual as a person who is alleged to have or
 may have planned, initiated, or participated in activities that are
 the subject of a report made to the compliance program office of an
 institution of higher education if, after completing an
 investigation, the office determines the report to be
 unsubstantiated or without merit.
 (d)  Subsection (c) does not apply to information related to
 an individual who consents to disclosure of the information.
 (e)  Information produced in a compliance program
 investigation the release of which would interfere with an ongoing
 compliance investigation is excepted from disclosure under Chapter
 552, Government Code.
 (f)  Information made confidential or excepted from public
 disclosure by this section may be made available to a law
 enforcement agency or prosecutor for official purposes of the
 agency or prosecutor upon proper request made in compliance with
 applicable law and procedure.
 SECTION 4. Section 51.9192, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to first-time students enrolling in public
 or private or independent institutions of higher education in this
 state on or after January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4189 was passed by the House on May
 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4189 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4189 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor