Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4231 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ritter, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 4231
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 7, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 7, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the conveyancing or transfer in this state of water
 imported into this state from a source located outside this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 11.0237(b), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b) This section does not alter the commission's
 obligations under Section 11.042(a-1), (b), [11.042(b)] or (c),
 11.046(b), 11.085(k)(2)(F), 11.134(b)(3)(D), 11.147, 11.1471,
 11.1491, 11.150, 11.152, 16.058, or 16.059.
 SECTION 2. Section 11.042, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  With prior authorization granted under rules
 prescribed by the commission, a person, association of persons,
 corporation, water control and improvement district, water
 improvement district, or irrigation district supplying water
 imported from a source located wholly outside the boundaries of
 this state, except water imported from a source located in the
 United Mexican States, may use the bed and banks of any flowing
 natural stream in the state to convey water for use in this state.
 The authorization must:
 (1)  allow for the diversion of only the amount of water
 put into a watercourse or stream, less carriage losses; and
 (2)  include special conditions adequate to prevent a
 significant impact to the quality of water in this state.
 SECTION 3. Section 11.085(v), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (v) The provisions of this section, except Subsection (a),
 do not apply to:
 (1) a proposed transfer which in combination with any
 existing transfers totals less than 3,000 acre-feet of water per
 annum from the same permit, certified filing, or certificate of
 adjudication;
 (2) a request for an emergency transfer of water;
 (3) a proposed transfer from a basin to its adjoining
 coastal basin; [or]
 (4) a proposed transfer from a basin to a county or
 municipality or the municipality's retail service area that is
 partially within the basin for use in that part of the county or
 municipality and the municipality's retail service area not within
 the basin; or
 (5) a proposed transfer of water that is:
 (A)  imported from a source located wholly outside
 the boundaries of this state, except water that is imported from a
 source located in the United Mexican States;
 (B) for use in this state; and
 (C)  transported by using the bed and banks of any
 flowing natural stream located in this state.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *