Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4275 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 4275


 AN ACT
 relating to the application process and scoring for the low income
 housing tax credit program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.6736 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.6736.  LOW INCOME HOUSING TAX CREDITS FINANCED
 UNDER AMERICAN RECOVERY AND REINVESTMENT ACT OF 2009.  (a)  To the
 extent the department receives federal funds under the American
 Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Pub. L. No. 111-5) or any
 subsequent law (including any extension or renewal thereof) that
 requires the department to award the federal funds in the same
 manner and subject to the same limitations as awards of housing tax
 credits, the following provisions shall apply.
 (b)  Any reference in this chapter to the administration of
 the housing tax credit program shall apply equally to the
 administration of such federal funds, except:
 (1)  the department may establish a separate
 application procedure for such funds, outside of the uniform
 application cycle referred to in Section 2306.1111 and the
 deadlines established in Section 2306.6724, and any reference
 herein to the application period shall refer to the period
 beginning on the date the department begins accepting applications
 for such funds and continuing until all such available funds are
 awarded;
 (2)  unless reauthorized, this section is repealed on
 August 31, 2011.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.6737 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.6737.  ASSISTANCE FROM AMERICAN RECOVERY AND
 REINVESTMENT ACT OF 2009.  If allowed by federal law, the department
 shall, under any federally funded program resulting from the
 American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Pub. L. No. 111-5),
 secure the interests of the state through bonds, an ownership
 interest in property, restrictive covenants filed in the real
 property records, and/or liens filed on a property for which the
 applicant has accepted funds until such a time as the department and
 the State of Texas do not have liability to repay or recapture such
 funds.
 SECTION 3. It is the intent of the legislature that the
 passage by the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, of another
 bill that amends Chapter 2306, Government Code, and the amendments
 made by this Act shall be harmonized, if possible, as provided by
 Section 311.025(b), Government Code, so that effect may be given to
 each. If the amendments made by this Act to Chapter 2306,
 Government Code, and the amendments made to Chapter 2306,
 Government Code, by any other bill are irreconcilable, it is the
 intent of the legislature that this Act prevail, regardless of the
 relative dates of enactment of this Act and the other bill or bills,
 but only to the extent that any differences are irreconcilable.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act relating to
 the evaluation of applications for financial assistance
 administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs apply only to an application submitted on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An application submitted before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the
 application was submitted, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4275 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 4, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 4275 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 4275 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 6, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4275 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 4275 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor