Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4276 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Menendez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 4276
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2009;
 May 7, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and
 Human Services; May 13, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 13, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a transportation plan for persons furloughed or
 discharged from certain mental health facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 574, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 574.089 to read as follows:
 Sec. 574.089.  TRANSPORTATION PLAN FOR FURLOUGH OR
 DISCHARGE. (a) The facility administrator of a mental health
 facility, in conjunction with the local mental health authority,
 shall create a transportation plan for a person scheduled to be
 furloughed or discharged from the facility.
 (b)  The transportation plan must account for the capacity of
 the person, must be in writing, and must specify:
 (1) who is responsible for transporting the person;
 (2) when the person will be transported; and
 (3) where the person will arrive.
 (c)  If the person consents, the facility administrator
 shall forward the transportation plan to a family member of the
 person before the person is transported.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *