Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4323 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R9110 BEF-F
 By: Chisum H.B. No. 4323


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of multipurpose residential fire
 protection sprinkler specialists by the Texas State Board of
 Plumbing Examiners.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1301.002, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (5-a) to read as follows:
 (5-a)  "Multipurpose residential fire protection
 sprinkler specialist" means a person who holds an endorsement
 issued under Section 1301.3565.
 SECTION 2. Section 1301.352, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.352. EXAMINATION REQUIRED. The board shall issue
 a license or endorsement as a master plumber, journeyman plumber,
 plumbing inspector, tradesman plumber-limited license holder,
 medical gas piping installation endorsement holder, [or] water
 supply protection specialist, or multipurpose residential fire
 protection sprinkler specialist to a person who demonstrates the
 fitness, competence, and qualifications to receive the license or
 endorsement by passing a uniform, reasonable examination.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter G, Chapter 1301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1301.3565 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.3565.  ENDORSEMENT:  MULTIPURPOSE RESIDENTIAL
 FIRE PROTECTION SPRINKLER SPECIALIST.  (a)  A person may not engage
 in the installation of a multipurpose residential fire protection
 sprinkler system that uses potable cold water to provide water for
 domestic plumbing fixtures and for fire protection sprinklers
 unless the person:
 (1)  is licensed under this chapter as a master plumber
 or journeyman plumber; and
 (2) holds an endorsement issued under this section.
 (b)  The board shall issue an endorsement as a multipurpose
 residential fire protection sprinkler specialist to a person who:
 (1) holds the license described by Subsection (a);
 (2)  applies to the board on a form prescribed by the
 board;
 (3) pays a fee set by the board;
 (4)  presents evidence satisfactory to the board of
 successful completion of a certification program approved by the
 board for multipurpose residential fire protection sprinkler
 specialists; and
 (5) passes an examination required by the board.
 (c)  An endorsement issued under this section is valid until
 the third anniversary of the date of issuance and may be renewed on
 compliance with any requirements prescribed by board rule.
 (d)  A person who holds an endorsement under this section may
 represent to the public that the person is a multipurpose
 residential fire protection sprinkler specialist.
 (e)  A plumbing inspector who meets the requirements of the
 board may inspect a multipurpose residential fire protection
 sprinkler installation.
 SECTION 4. (a) Not later than November 1, 2009, the Texas
 State Board of Plumbing Examiners shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement Section 1301.3565, Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act.
 (b) Not later than December 1, 2009, the Texas State Board
 of Plumbing Examiners shall begin administering examinations and
 issuing multipurpose residential fire protection sprinkler
 specialist endorsements under Section 1301.3565, Occupations Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 (b) Section 1301.3565(a), Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, takes effect March 1, 2010.