Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4353 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 4353
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 14, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing of certain nurses who will practice in
 border counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.262 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.262.  SPECIAL LICENSE.  (a)  The board may issue a
 license under this section to a person licensed to practice nursing
 in Mexico if the person:
 (1)  graduated from an accredited nursing program in
 Mexico;
 (2)  provides a report acceptable to the board issued
 by a credentials evaluation service approved by the board;
 (3)  applies on a form prescribed by the board and pays
 the fee required by the board;
 (4)  has received a score of at least 475 on a Test of
 English as a Foreign Language examination;
 (5)  has received a score acceptable to the board on an
 English language version of the appropriate National Council
 Licensure Examination;
 (6)  is eligible for employment in the United States;
 and
 (7)  will practice nursing in a county that borders
 Mexico.
 (b)  A license issued under this section is valid for one
 year and may not be renewed.  A person who holds or has held a
 license issued under this section may apply for another type of
 license under this chapter.
 (c)  A person who holds a license issued under this section
 may practice nursing only as an employee of a hospital located in a
 county that borders Mexico.
 (d)  A person who holds a license issued under this section
 is not entitled to a multistate licensing privilege to practice
 under the Nurse Licensure Compact under Chapter 304.
 (e) This section expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *