Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4393 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 20, 2009      TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB4393 by Farias (Relating to the creation of a pilot program to provide electronic prescribing tools to rural physicians.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill requires that the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) develop a pilot program providing electronic prescribing (e-Prescribing) tools at no cost to no more than fifty rural physicians in five counties in the state. Tools provided must include e-prescribing software, a high speed internet connection, training and, if necessary, electronic equipment. The e-Prescribing tools must enable rural physicians participating in the pilot program to access drug formularies,  pertinent patient information, maintain prescription tracking histories and submit prescriptions electronically.  HHSC estimates that the tools and associated implementation costs for each e-Prescriber participating in the pilot can be procured at a minimal cost that can be absorbed within existing resources. The bill allows the use of a contractor to deliver services and select the physicians that will participate in the pilot. The bill also requires that HHSC develop rules, baseline measures and oversight for the pilot.  HHSC may delay implentation of the pilot program if it is determined that a federal waiver or authorization is required. The bill would require HHSC to submit a report on the implementation of the pilot, including an assessment of benefits and future recommendations. The report is due to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house and the legislature by January 1, 2010.  This subchapter would expire on September 1, 2011. The bill takes effect on September 1, 2009. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, MH, GD    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 20, 2009





  TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB4393 by Farias (Relating to the creation of a pilot program to provide electronic prescribing tools to rural physicians.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB4393 by Farias (Relating to the creation of a pilot program to provide electronic prescribing tools to rural physicians.), As Introduced

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB4393 by Farias (Relating to the creation of a pilot program to provide electronic prescribing tools to rural physicians.), As Introduced

HB4393 by Farias (Relating to the creation of a pilot program to provide electronic prescribing tools to rural physicians.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill requires that the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) develop a pilot program providing electronic prescribing (e-Prescribing) tools at no cost to no more than fifty rural physicians in five counties in the state. Tools provided must include e-prescribing software, a high speed internet connection, training and, if necessary, electronic equipment. The e-Prescribing tools must enable rural physicians participating in the pilot program to access drug formularies,  pertinent patient information, maintain prescription tracking histories and submit prescriptions electronically.  HHSC estimates that the tools and associated implementation costs for each e-Prescriber participating in the pilot can be procured at a minimal cost that can be absorbed within existing resources. The bill allows the use of a contractor to deliver services and select the physicians that will participate in the pilot. The bill also requires that HHSC develop rules, baseline measures and oversight for the pilot.  HHSC may delay implentation of the pilot program if it is determined that a federal waiver or authorization is required. The bill would require HHSC to submit a report on the implementation of the pilot, including an assessment of benefits and future recommendations. The report is due to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house and the legislature by January 1, 2010.  This subchapter would expire on September 1, 2011. The bill takes effect on September 1, 2009.

The bill requires that the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) develop a pilot program providing electronic prescribing (e-Prescribing) tools at no cost to no more than fifty rural physicians in five counties in the state. Tools provided must include e-prescribing software, a high speed internet connection, training and, if necessary, electronic equipment. The e-Prescribing tools must enable rural physicians participating in the pilot program to access drug formularies,  pertinent patient information, maintain prescription tracking histories and submit prescriptions electronically.  HHSC estimates that the tools and associated implementation costs for each e-Prescriber participating in the pilot can be procured at a minimal cost that can be absorbed within existing resources.

The bill allows the use of a contractor to deliver services and select the physicians that will participate in the pilot. The bill also requires that HHSC develop rules, baseline measures and oversight for the pilot.  HHSC may delay implentation of the pilot program if it is determined that a federal waiver or authorization is required.

The bill would require HHSC to submit a report on the implementation of the pilot, including an assessment of benefits and future recommendations. The report is due to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house and the legislature by January 1, 2010.  This subchapter would expire on September 1, 2011.

The bill takes effect on September 1, 2009.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission

529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, MH, GD

 JOB, CL, MH, GD