Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4409 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor, Eiland (Senate Sponsor - Jackson) H.B. No. 4409
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2009;
 May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 23, 2009, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4409 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to emergency preparation and management.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 418.006 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.006.  CIVIL LIABILITY.  An officer or employee of a
 state or local agency, or a volunteer acting at the direction of an
 officer or employee of a state or local agency, is considered for
 purposes of Section 431.085 to be a member of the state military
 forces ordered into active service of the state by proper authority
 and is considered to be discharging a duty in that capacity if the
 person is performing an activity related to sheltering or housing
 individuals in connection with the evacuation of an area stricken
 or threatened by disaster.
 SECTION 2. Section 418.043, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 418.043. OTHER POWERS AND DUTIES. The division shall:
 (1) determine requirements of the state and its
 political subdivisions for food, clothing, and other necessities in
 event of a disaster;
 (2) procure and position supplies, medicines,
 materials, and equipment;
 (3) adopt standards and requirements for local and
 interjurisdictional emergency management plans;
 (4) periodically review local and interjurisdictional
 emergency management plans;
 (5) coordinate deployment of mobile support units;
 (6) establish and operate training programs and
 programs of public information or assist political subdivisions and
 emergency management agencies to establish and operate the
 programs;
 (7) make surveys of public and private industries,
 resources, and facilities in the state that are necessary to carry
 out the purposes of this chapter;
 (8) plan and make arrangements for the availability
 and use of any private facilities, services, and property and
 provide for payment for use under terms and conditions agreed on if
 the facilities are used and payment is necessary;
 (9) establish a register of persons with types of
 training and skills important in disaster mitigation,
 preparedness, response, and recovery;
 (10) establish a register of mobile and construction
 equipment and temporary housing available for use in a disaster;
 (11) assist political subdivisions in developing
 plans for the humane evacuation, transport, and temporary
 sheltering of service animals and household pets in a disaster;
 (12) prepare, for issuance by the governor, executive
 orders and regulations necessary or appropriate in coping with
 disasters;
 (13) cooperate with the federal government and any
 public or private agency or entity in achieving any purpose of this
 chapter and in implementing programs for disaster mitigation,
 preparation, response, and recovery; [and]
 (14) define "individuals with special needs" in the
 context of a disaster; and
 (15) do other things necessary, incidental, or
 appropriate for the implementation of this chapter.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter F, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 418.126 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.126.  PRE-EVENT DISASTER RESPONSE CONTRACTS.  (a)
 The General Land Office shall solicit proposals for and enter into
 one or more pre-event contracts that may be activated by the office
 in the event of a weather-related disaster declaration to obtain
 services for debris removal from beaches as needed following the
 disaster.
 (b)  The Texas Department of Transportation shall solicit
 proposals for and enter into one or more pre-event contracts that
 may be activated by the department in the event of a weather-related
 disaster declaration to obtain services for debris removal from the
 state highway system as needed following the disaster.
 (c)  The Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs
 shall solicit proposals for and enter into one or more pre-event
 contracts that may be activated by the department in the event of a
 weather-related disaster declaration to obtain temporary or
 emergency housing as needed following the disaster.
 (d)  Services obtained under a pre-event contract under this
 section may be paid for with money from the disaster contingency
 fund under Section 418.073.
 SECTION 4. Subtitle G, Title 10, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 2311 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 2311.  ENERGY SECURITY TECHNOLOGIES FOR CRITICAL
 GOVERNMENTAL FACILITIES
 Sec. 2311.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Combined heating and power system" means a system
 that:
 (A) is located on the site of a facility;
 (B)  is the primary source of both electricity and
 thermal energy for the facility;
 (C)  can provide all of the electricity needed to
 power the facility's critical emergency operations for at least 14
 days; and
 (D)  has an overall efficiency of energy use that
 exceeds 60 percent.
 (2)  "Critical governmental facility" means a building
 owned by the state or a political subdivision of the state that is
 expected to:
 (A) be continuously occupied;
 (B)  maintain operations for at least 6,000 hours
 each year;
 (C)  have a peak electricity demand exceeding 500
 kilowatts; and
 (D)  serve a critical public health or public
 safety function during a natural disaster or other emergency
 situation that may result in a widespread power outage, including
 a:
 (i) command and control center;
 (ii) shelter;
 (iii) prison or jail;
 (iv) police or fire station;
 (v) communications or data center;
 (vi) water or wastewater facility;
 (vii) hazardous waste storage facility;
 (viii) biological research facility;
 (ix) hospital; or
 (x)  food preparation or food storage
 facility.
 Sec. 2311.002.  COMBINED HEATING AND POWER SYSTEMS. When
 constructing or extensively renovating a critical governmental
 facility or replacing major heating, ventilation, and
 air-conditioning equipment for a critical governmental facility,
 the entity with charge and control of the facility shall evaluate
 whether equipping the facility with a combined heating and power
 system would result in expected energy savings that would exceed
 the expected costs of purchasing, operating, and maintaining the
 system over a 20-year period. The entity may equip the facility
 with a combined heating and power system if the expected energy
 savings exceed the expected costs.
 SECTION 5. Not later than January 1, 2010, the relevant
 state agencies shall adopt the contracts required by Section
 418.126, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *