Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB4433 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez H.B. No. 4433


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from the severance tax for certain gas and
 oil produced.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 202.056, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (c) and (d) and adding Subsection (d-1) to
 read as follows:
 (c) If the commission designates a three-year inactive well
 under this section, it shall issue a certificate designating the
 well as a three-year inactive well as defined by Subsection (a)(3)
 of this section. The commission may not designate a three-year
 inactive well under this section after February 29, 1996. If the
 commission designates a two-year inactive well under this section,
 it shall issue a certificate designating the well as a two-year
 inactive well as defined by Subsection (a)(4) of this section. The
 commission may not designate a two-year inactive well under this
 section after February 28, 2020 [2010].
 (d) An application for three-year inactive well
 certification shall be made during the period of September 1, 1993,
 through August 31, 1995, to qualify for the tax exemption under this
 section. An application for two-year inactive well certification
 shall be made during the period September 1, 1997, through August
 31, 2019 [2009], to qualify for the tax exemption under this
 section. Hydrocarbons sold after the date of certification are
 eligible for the tax exemption.
 (d-1)  The comptroller shall certify the first date on which
 the prices of oil and gas have been at or below the respective
 prices described by Section 171.1011(s) for three continuous
 months.  The commission may issue a certificate under Subsection
 (c) only if the application for certification is received by the
 commission not later than the 90th day after the date the
 comptroller makes the certification under this subsection.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 201, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 201.060 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.060.  EXEMPTION FOR GAS INCIDENTALLY PRODUCED IN
 PRODUCTION OF GEOTHERMAL ENERGY. Gas incidentally produced in the
 production of geothermal energy is exempt from the severance tax
 imposed by this chapter.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 202, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 202.062 to read as follows:
 Sec. 202.062.  EXEMPTION FOR OIL INCIDENTALLY PRODUCED IN
 PRODUCTION OF GEOTHERMAL ENERGY. Oil incidentally produced in the
 production of geothermal energy is exempt from the severance tax
 imposed by this chapter.
 SECTION 4. For purposes of making a certification under
 Section 202.056(d-1), Tax Code, as added by this Act, the
 comptroller may not consider the price of oil on dates before
 October 1, 2009.
 SECTION 5. Sections 201.060 and 202.062, Tax Code, as added
 by this Act, apply only to gas or oil produced on or after the
 effective date of this Act. Gas or oil produced before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the
 gas or oil was produced, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.